|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2811.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 1182.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 857.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|