LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB233
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB233
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB233
Compare Versions
SB233 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB233 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB233 Amended August 25, 2011
SB233 Amended July 14, 2011
SB233 Amended July 11, 2011
SB233 Amended June 28, 2011
SB233 Amended May 18, 2011
SB233 Amended May 4, 2011
SB233 Amended March 31, 2011
SB233 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB233 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB233 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB233 Amended August 25, 2011
SB233 Amended July 14, 2011
SB233 Amended July 11, 2011
SB233 Amended June 28, 2011
SB233 Amended May 18, 2011
SB233 Amended May 4, 2011
SB233 Amended March 31, 2011
SB233 Introduced February 9, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare