|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 1749.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 11. Page 2162.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 478.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 359.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|