01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/19/2012 | Set for hearing January 19. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/02/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 542.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/29/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set for hearing April 4. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
02/10/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |||
02/09/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |