|
08/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 984.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 540.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|