01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/02/2011 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 5. Page 854.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/14/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/04/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set for hearing April 4. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. | |||
02/10/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |||
02/09/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |