06/02/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 1285.) | |||
05/27/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 16. Page 1142.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Corbett. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1142.) | |||
05/26/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/17/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/16/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 950.) (May 10). | |||
05/02/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 10. | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/10/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | |||
02/09/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |