|
06/26/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 986.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 854.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|