01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/09/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/03/2011 | Set for hearing May 9. | |||
05/02/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 643.) (April 12). | |||
03/29/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/25/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/04/2011 | Set for hearing March 29. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and RLS. | |||
02/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | |||
02/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |