|
07/03/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1114.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 764.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 617.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|