LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB253
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB253
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB253
Action History
01/31/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/06/2012
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
12/15/2011
Set for hearing January 11.
02/24/2011
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
02/11/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
02/10/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.