|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 449, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5061.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 6173.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2696.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2648.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2011
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|