01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/02/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. (Vote only.) | |||
04/27/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 786.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/21/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/15/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | |||
02/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |