|
09/30/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6202.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2718.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2685.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 416.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|