|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 500, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2405.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3015.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1111.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 417.) (March 22).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|