01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/26/2011 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |||
04/05/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
03/31/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/23/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set for hearing April 4. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | |||
02/11/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | |||
02/10/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |