|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2463.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 3146.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 2867.) Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 2867.) Read third time and amended. (Page 2868.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Motion to reconsider continued to September 2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 34. Page 2754.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Huffman.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2634.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1267.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1114.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 854.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 619.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|