|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 232, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1909.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 764.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|