01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/02/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/13/2011 | Set for hearing May 2. | |||
04/06/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 493.) (March 30). | |||
03/18/2011 | Set for hearing March 30. | |||
03/17/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/09/2011 | Set for hearing March 23. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |