LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB27
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB27
Compare Versions
SB27 Amended August 15, 2011
SB27 Amended July 7, 2011
SB27 Amended June 28, 2011
SB27 Amended March 3, 2011
SB27 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB27 Amended August 15, 2011
SB27 Amended July 7, 2011
SB27 Amended June 28, 2011
SB27 Amended March 3, 2011
SB27 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare