|
08/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2345.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1138.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 951.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|