|
09/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2807.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1139.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 845.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|