|
02/02/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2076.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 876.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 580.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|