07/08/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/07/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/29/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |||
06/23/2011 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/23/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2053.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/15/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). | |||
04/28/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
04/14/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 654.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 558.) (April 6). | |||
03/29/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 6. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |