LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB29
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB29
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB29
Compare Versions
SB29 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB29 Amended August 26, 2011
SB29 Amended May 11, 2011
SB29 Amended April 5, 2011
SB29 Amended March 22, 2011
SB29 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB29 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB29 Amended August 26, 2011
SB29 Amended May 11, 2011
SB29 Amended April 5, 2011
SB29 Amended March 22, 2011
SB29 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare