|
08/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2343.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 655.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 496.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|