|
07/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 2051.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 741.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|