|
09/02/2011
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2806.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 2862.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1140.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 850.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|