|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 701, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2997.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1085.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 809.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|