LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB298
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB298
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB298
Compare Versions
SB298 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB298 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB298 Amended April 26, 2011
SB298 Amended March 17, 2011
SB298 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB298 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB298 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB298 Amended April 26, 2011
SB298 Amended March 17, 2011
SB298 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare