California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill June 20, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill April 12, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011