08/17/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
07/07/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/11/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 948.) (May 11). | |||
04/27/2011 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/07/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/25/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |