|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2239.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 2744.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 1237.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 850.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|