|
08/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1237.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 759.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|