LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB309
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB309
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB309
Compare Versions
SB309 Chaptered October 4, 2011
SB309 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB309 Amended August 29, 2011
SB309 Amended June 16, 2011
SB309 Amended May 10, 2011
SB309 Amended March 21, 2011
SB309 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB309 Chaptered October 4, 2011
SB309 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB309 Amended August 29, 2011
SB309 Amended June 16, 2011
SB309 Amended May 10, 2011
SB309 Amended March 21, 2011
SB309 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare