|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2685.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2622.) (January 10). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
12/21/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|