01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/10/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 2624.) | |||
12/15/2011 | Set for hearing January 10. | |||
03/22/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/15/2011 | Set for hearing March 29. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |