01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/11/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 2648.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
12/15/2011 | Set for hearing January 11. | |||
05/02/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 742.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/07/2011 | Set for hearing April 26. | |||
04/06/2011 | Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |||
03/31/2011 | Set for hearing April 12. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |||
03/23/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
03/15/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | |||
02/15/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |||
02/14/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |