|
08/27/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 1268.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|