|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected July 12.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1226.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|