01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/13/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/11/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 2639.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/06/2012 | Set for hearing January 11. | |||
01/05/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |