|
01/31/2012
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 2685.)
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2648.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 2639.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
Set for hearing January 11. Set for hearing January 11 in HEALTH pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. (Corrected January 4.) Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/21/2011
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|