|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 264, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1912.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 2261.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 896.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 764.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|