|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2463.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 3110.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2712.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2589.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1226.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 852.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|