01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/26/2011 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/20/2011 | Set for hearing May 26. | |||
05/16/2011 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/06/2011 | Set for hearing May 16. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 852.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing May 3. | |||
04/05/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/25/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |