|
02/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2390.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1226.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 417.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|