06/18/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
01/26/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2718.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
01/23/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/19/2012 | Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 2686.) (January 19). | |||
01/17/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
01/11/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing January 17. | |||
01/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2622.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/05/2012 | Set for hearing January 9. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |