LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB353
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB353
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB353
Action History
01/31/2012
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
06/09/2011
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
04/04/2011
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/10/2011
Set for hearing April 12.
02/24/2011
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q.
02/16/2011
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
02/15/2011
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.