01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/11/2011 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 948.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/27/2011 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/07/2011 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/30/2011 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/16/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |||
02/15/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |