|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Veto sustained. (Ayes 13. Noes 22. Page 2681.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Blakeslee. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2681.)
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2454.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3167.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2814.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1115.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 740.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|